Governor Business Interests 2016/17
Name of Governor | Interest Y/N | Information of interest | Date interest ceased | Notes | Date Completed |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Bamfield | Y | Teacher | On-going | Teacher at a local school | 14/09/2016 |
Victoria Adusei | Y | Parent | On-going | 07/10/2016 | |
Natalie Patel | Y | Education Policy Institute | On-going | Education Research | 10/09/2016 |
Ros Sandell | Y | Executive Head | On-going | 23/09/2016 | |
Jo Hussey | Y | Head of School | On-going | 10/10/2016 | |
Karen O'Connor | Y | Teacher | On-going | 14/09/2016 | |
Oliver Lewis | Y |
Councillor Employee
Member
Member
Member |
On-going |
Local Authority iMPOWER Consultancing LTD
The Labour Party
The Co-operative Party
GMB |
02/11/2016 |
Niville Anozia | Y | Parent | On-going | 10/10/2016 | |
Kathleen Conroy | Y | Relative | On-going | Relative of staff member | 27/09/2016 |
Lynn Bruce | Y | Staff | On-going | Governance clerk at other Croydon/Bromley schools, Childminder, Presiding Officer at elections, Rest Centre Manager and Welfare Officer - Addiscombe Little League Football | 05/09/2016 |